MO HB1849 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions related to the display of posters containing representations of the Missouri state flag and other items in public schools.
Title
Creates new provisions related to the display of posters containing representations of the Missouri state flag and other items in public schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1849&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4403H.01I.pdf |