MO HB1698 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the definition of "liquor store" as it applies to the provisions regarding temporary assistance for needy families benefits
Title
Revises the definition of "liquor store" as it applies to the provisions regarding temporary assistance for needy families benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred: Children, Families, and Persons with Disabilities(H) |
2014-02-03 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1698&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1698I.htm |