MO HB1683 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Alzheimer's State Plan Task Force."
Title
Establishes the "Alzheimer's State Plan Task Force."
Sponsors
Rep. David Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: HB 1683 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 154 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2020-04-30 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-30 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 8:00 a.m., Wednesday, April 29, 2020, Senate Chamber |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Seniors, Families and Children(S) |
2020-03-02 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-03-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 154 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-02-24 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2020-02-24 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-02-24 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-30 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-29 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Aging(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-11 | House | Prefiled (H) |