MO HB1640 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to workers' compensation
Title
Modifies provisions relating to workers' compensation
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Seitz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2022-04-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred: Public Safety(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |