MO HB1543 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the bridge on Highway 185 crossing over Interstate 44 in Franklin County as the "James K. Schatz Memorial Bridge"
Title
Designates the bridge on Highway 185 crossing over Interstate 44 in Franklin County as the "James K. Schatz Memorial Bridge"
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Hinson [R] | Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-24 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-24 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-19 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2014-01-23 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1543&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1543I.htm |