MO HB1542 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Second read and referred: Senate Insurance and Banking(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits certain actions by pharmacy benefits managers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits certain actions by pharmacy benefits managers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - House - House: HB 1542 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 138 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Insurance and Banking(S)
2018-04-19HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-04-19HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 138 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-19HouseTaken Up
2018-04-17HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted
2018-04-17HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2018-04-17HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-04-17HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-03-28HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-14HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-08HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-03-08HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-06HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-20HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-02-15HouseReferred: Insurance Policy(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-07HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback