MO HB1503 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Moves Taney County from the 38th Judicial Circuit to the newly established 46th Judicial Circuit and specifies that the 38th Judicial Circuit will consist only of Christian County
Title
Moves Taney County from the 38th Judicial Circuit to the newly established 46th Judicial Circuit and specifies that the 38th Judicial Circuit will consist only of Christian County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Judiciary (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2010-01-04 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1503&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1503I.htm |