MO HB1496 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-10 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-10 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Operation Enduring Freedom, Operation Freedom's Sentinel and Operation Allies Refuge Program" which authorizes the issuance of a medallion, medal, and certificate to certain veterans who served in specified conflicts
Title
Establishes the "Operation Enduring Freedom, Operation Freedom's Sentinel and Operation Allies Refuge Program" which authorizes the issuance of a medallion, medal, and certificate to certain veterans who served in specified conflicts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House: HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - AMENDED 1 - Wednesday, April 10, 2024, 11:00 a.m., Senate Lounge. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 2, 2024, 12:00 p.m., Senate Lounge. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions(S) |
2024-03-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2024-03-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-11 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | Perfected (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-03-06 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-03-04 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |