MO HB1496 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the provision prohibiting the state from collecting fees under the Beef Commodity Merchandising Program in excess of the amount credited against the obligation to pay any federal assessments
Title
Repeals the provision prohibiting the state from collecting fees under the Beef Commodity Merchandising Program in excess of the amount credited against the obligation to pay any federal assessments
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Reiboldt [R] | Rep. Bill Lant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, april 9, 2014, 12:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2014-03-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 125 NOES: 26 |
2014-03-04 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-03 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2014-01-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |