MO HB1183 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Administration And Accounts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Administration And Accounts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits sexual harassment of unpaid interns
Title
Prohibits sexual harassment of unpaid interns
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred: Administration and Accounts(H) |
2021-02-19 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |