MO HB1145 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a health carrier to provide access to its standard fee schedules, prohibits a carrier from refusing to contract with any willing provider, and changes the requirements for provider referrals
Title
Requires a health carrier to provide access to its standard fee schedules, prohibits a carrier from refusing to contract with any willing provider, and changes the requirements for provider referrals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Health Care Policy(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1145&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1145I.htm |