MO HB1140 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to professional licensing reciprocity.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to professional licensing reciprocity.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Lynch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2019-03-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1140&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/2393H.01I.pdf |