MO HB1023 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to administrative fees charged by dealers licensed by the Department of Revenue

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to administrative fees charged by dealers licensed by the Department of Revenue

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2021-04-13HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-04-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-24HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-03-24HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-23HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-23HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-09HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-02-11HouseReferred: Special Committee on Small Business(H)
2021-02-03HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-02-02HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback