MO HB1008 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to covenants involving business entities
Title
Modifies provisions relating to covenants involving business entities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - House: HB 1008 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-05-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 10 |
2021-05-04 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-29 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 Adopted |
2021-04-29 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-29 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |