MI HB4722 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-27 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Land use: zoning and growth management; Michigan zoning enabling act; amend to include short-term rentals. Amends 2006 PA 110 (MCL 125.3101 - 125.3702) by adding sec. 206b.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land use: zoning and growth management; Michigan zoning enabling act; amend to include short-term rentals. Amends 2006 PA 110 (MCL 125.3101 - 125.3702) by adding sec. 206b.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 503 (Y: 55 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 502 (Y: 55 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-27SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2021-10-27HouseTransmitted
2021-10-27HouseReps. Sara Cambensy, Samantha Steckloff, Brad Paquette Removed As Co-sponsors
2021-10-27HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 503 Yeas 55 Nays 48 Excused 0 Not Voting 6
2021-10-27HouseVote Reconsidered
2021-10-27HousePassed Roll Call # 502 Yeas 55 Nays 47 Excused 0 Not Voting 7
2021-10-27HouseRead A Third Time
2021-10-27HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-10-27HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-10-27HouseSubstitute (h-11) Adopted
2021-10-27HouseSubstitute (h-1) Not Adopted
2021-10-27HouseRead A Second Time
2021-05-25HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-05-25HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-04-28HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 04/27/2021
2021-04-27HouseReferred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism
2021-04-27HouseRead A First Time
2021-04-27HouseIntroduced By Representative Sarah Lightner

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4722
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4722.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4722.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4722-0N295.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4722-0O339.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4722-3B337E2A.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4722-50DCEA4D.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4722-374ECB7E.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-05-25-047.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-10-27-089.htm

Bill Comments

feedback