ME LD734 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Set a Minimum Wage for School Support Staff
Title
An Act To Set a Minimum Wage for School Support Staff
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #318 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #60 (Y: 73 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #60 (Y: 73 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-135) in concurrence |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-135) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 318 Yeas 20 - Nays 14 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-02 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, in concurrence |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-135). |
2021-05-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-05-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-135) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-05-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 60 (Yeas 73 - Nays 71 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2021-05-19 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-05-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-04-21 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-21 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |