MD SB811 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Fraud Division of the Maryland Insurance Administration to investigate allegations and to impose penalties under specified circumstances; providing that a fine imposed for specified insurance fraud violations is mandatory and not subject to suspension; authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to impose an administrative penalty for specified insurance fraud violations and to order restitution to specified insurers or self-insured employers of specified proceeds paid; etc.
Title
Insurance - Fraud Violations - Fines and Administrative Penalties
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] | Sen. Barry Glassman [R] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] |
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-18 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments 367471/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-02-20 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Fines
Fraud
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Investigations and Inquiries
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Penalties and Sentences
Restitution
Fines
Fraud
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Investigations and Inquiries
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Penalties and Sentences
Restitution