MD SB801 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Including employment with the Chesapeake Bay Commission as eligible service with the State for participation as a retiree in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; authorizing the State to charge the Commission for the participation in the Program; and providing that the subsidy for employees and retirees of the Commission shall be the same subsidy provided for active and retired State employees.
Title
State Health Plan - Chesapeake Bay Commission - Retirees
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment 903127/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (Y: 51 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment 903127/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (Y: 51 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-2) |
2022-04-06 | House | Floor Amendment {903127/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (51-82) |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2022-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-03-29 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {173021/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 8:30 a.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Committees and Commissions
Health
Health Insurance
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
State Government - Personnel
Welfare
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Health
Health Insurance
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
State Government - Personnel
Welfare
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 2 | 511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |