MD SB746 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 335
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 335
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Fire Marshal to enforce any requirements relating to the installation of automatic sprinkler systems in new one- and two-family dwellings.
Title
State Fire Marshal – Sprinkler Systems Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 335 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-30) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-1) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB823 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 334
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 6 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 6 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |