MD SB637 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "DNA profile" for purposes of provisions of law concerning the admissibility of a DNA profile in a criminal proceeding; providing that a DNA profile is admissible for specified purposes if accompanied by a specified statement that analysis of genetic loci has been validated according to specified quality assurance standards of the Technical Working Group on DNA Analysis Methods (TWGDAM) or of the Federal Bureau of Investigation; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Evidence - Admissibility of DNA Profile - Definition and Validation of DNA Profile
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {392518/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-22 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {688275/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |