MD SB637 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a provider contract from containing a provision that requires a dental provider, as a condition of continued participation in specified dental provider panels, to accept an added, revised, or amended fee schedule that contains a lower fee; and providing that the Act applies to all dental provider contracts issued, renewed, or amended in the State on or after October 1, 2010.
Title
Health Insurance - Dental Provider Panels - Provider Contracts
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Exum [D] | Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] |
Sen. E.J. Pipkin [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-31 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading Finance |