MD SB57 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB47
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that it is lawful for a person to intercept an oral communication if the person is working as a fair housing tester for a fair housing testing program operated by the federal government, the State, a local government, or a nonprofit civil rights organization under certain circumstances; and providing that the contents of an intercepted oral communication may be used only for the purpose of enforcing federal, State, or local fair housing laws.
Title
Evidence - Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Fair Housing Testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Floor Amendment 423027/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Floor Amendment 423027/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (28-17) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment {753327/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment {423027/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-26) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {753124/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {753124/1 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Carry Over) 2023-01-16 - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
HB392 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
HB392 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Civil Rights and Social Equity
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Electronic Surveillance
Evidence
Federal Government
Grand Juries
Hearings
Housing
Housing and Community Development
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Trials
Wiretapping
Civil Rights and Social Equity
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Electronic Surveillance
Evidence
Federal Government
Grand Juries
Hearings
Housing
Housing and Community Development
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Trials
Wiretapping
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 10 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 10 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |