MD SB517 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the process by which the County Commissioners of Washington County make contributions to specified nonprofit organizations in Washington County; altering the deadline for submission of applications for contributions; requiring the County Commissioners to hold a public hearing on the applications; authorizing the County Commissioners to remove specified organizations from a specified list and, on request by the organization, to revise or amend the name of an organization; etc.
Title
Washington County - Contributions to Nonprofit Organizations - Process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-04 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Gifts
Hearings
Names
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Information
Washington County
County Commissioners
Gifts
Hearings
Names
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Information
Washington County