MD SB517 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of criminal gang to repeal the requirement that an association of three or more persons whose members meet specified criteria be ongoing; altering specified factors that persons can have in common to be considered a criminal gang; altering the list of underlying crimes for criminal gang activity; altering a specified prohibition concerning participation in criminal gang activity to repeal the requirement that a pattern of criminal gang activity be ongoing; etc.
Title
Maryland Gang Prosecution Act of 2010
Sponsors
Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Nancy Jacobs [R] | Sen. Alexander Mooney [R] | Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] |
Sen. Norman Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Kelley) {133528/1 Rejected (Y: 11 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Gladden) {343924/2 Rejected (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Lenett) {153822/1 Rejected (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Pugh) {823426/3 Rejected (Y: 11 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Pugh) {993322/1 Rejected (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-04 - Senate - Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Pugh) Adopted (Y: 23 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Kelley) {133528/1 Rejected (Y: 11 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Gladden) {343924/2 Rejected (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Lenett) {153822/1 Rejected (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Pugh) {823426/3 Rejected (Y: 11 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Pugh) {993322/1 Rejected (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-04 - Senate - Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Pugh) Adopted (Y: 23 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (116-25) | |
2010-04-08 | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (120-20) | |
2010-04-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-08 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Gutierrez) Rejected (25-106) | |
2010-04-08 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Braveboy) Rejected (32-101) | |
2010-04-08 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Rejected (34-98) | |
2010-04-08 | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) | |
2010-04-08 | Motion Special Order later today (Delegate Gutierrez) Rejected (22-107) | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2010-04-12 | Hearing 4/12 at 4:00 p.m. | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred Judiciary | |
2010-04-06 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-04-10 | Returned Passed | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (35-9) | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-06 | Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) Rejected (11-35) | |
2010-04-06 | Floor Amendment (Senator Gladden) Rejected (17-29) | |
2010-04-06 | Floor Amendment (Senator Lenett) Rejected (21-26) | |
2010-04-06 | Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) Rejected (11-34) | |
2010-04-06 | Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) Rejected (15-31) | |
2010-04-06 | Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Special Order later today (Senator Jones) Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (36-11) | |
2010-04-06 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-04-04 | Special Order 4/9 (Senator Pugh) Adopted (23-21) | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-12 | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |