MD SB494 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB418
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the application of certain testing, certification, and enforcement requirements for certain efficiency standards; requiring the Maryland Energy Administration to review certain efficiency standards on or before January 1, 2023; prohibiting the sale, offering for sale, and installation of certain products in the State under certain circumstances beginning on a certain date; requiring the Administration to adopt regulations on efficiency standards for certain products on or before January 1, 2023; etc.
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Energy and Water Efficiency Standards - Alterations
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] | Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Sen. Mary Washington [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {993626/1 Adopted |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB418 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
HB772 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 564
HB772 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 564
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Certifications
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Examinations
Labor, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Water
Certifications
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Examinations
Labor, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 2006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |