MD HB772 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB418
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 564
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 564
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the application of certain testing, certification, and enforcement requirements for certain efficiency standards; requiring the Maryland Energy Administration to review certain efficiency standards on or before January 1, 2023; prohibiting the sale, offering for sale, and installation of certain products in the State under certain circumstances beginning on a certain date; requiring the Administration to adopt regulations on efficiency standards for certain products on or before January 1, 2023; etc.
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Energy and Water Efficiency Standards - Alterations
Sponsors
Del. Sheila Ruth [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Floor Amendment 383423/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 93 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Floor Amendment 383423/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 93 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 564 |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-39) |
2022-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | House | Floor Amendment {383423/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (42-93) |
2022-03-15 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Adams) Adopted |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {463627/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB494 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-07 - Referred Environment and Transportation
SB418 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
SB418 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Certifications
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Examinations
Labor, Department of
restrooms
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Water
Weights and Measures
Certifications
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Examinations
Labor, Department of
restrooms
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Water
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 2006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |