MD SB450 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB834
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 657
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 657
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "harassment" for purposes of certain provisions relating to discrimination in employment to include sexual harassment and certain unwelcome and offensive conduct; and altering the definition of "sexual harassment" for purposes of certain provisions relating to State government sexual harassment prevention training.
Title
Harassment and Sexual Harassment - Definitions - Employment Discrimination and Sexual Harassment Prevention Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 657 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (105-24) |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB834 (Carry Over) 2021-04-12 - Favorable Report by Economic Matters
HB1393 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-15 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1393 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-15 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Discrimination
Harassment
Human Relations
Sexual Offenses
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor, and Employment
Harassment
Human Relations
Sexual Offenses
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 20 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 2 | 203.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |