MD SB834 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB450
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "harassment" and defining "sexual harassment" for purposes of certain provisions relating to discrimination in employment to include conduct, which need not be severe or pervasive, that consists of unwelcome sexual advances, requests for sexual favors, or other conduct of a sexual nature under certain circumstances; altering the definition of "sexual harassment" for certain provisions relating to State government sexual harassment prevention training; etc.
Title
Harassment and Sexual Harassment – Definitions – Employment Discrimination and Sexual Harassment Prevention Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {553323/1 Adopted |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB834 (Carry Over) 2021-04-12 - Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 20 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 2 | 203.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |