MD SB448 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county board of education to provide transportation to and from school for certain students using a vehicle other than a Type I or Type II school vehicle when a school vehicle cannot reasonably be provided; requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with county boards of education and the Motor Vehicle Administration, to adopt regulations governing minimum vehicle and driver safety standards; requiring each county board to submit a report on student transportation using certain vehicles by September 1, 2025; etc.
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles and Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-1) |
2021-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {455961/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {664836/1 Adopted |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB72 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Subjects
Age
Calvert County
Contractors
Contracts
Counties
Disabilities
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Foster Care
Indigent Persons
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Buses
Students
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Work, Labor, and Employment
Youth
Calvert County
Contractors
Contracts
Counties
Disabilities
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Foster Care
Indigent Persons
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Buses
Students
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Work, Labor, and Employment
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 11 | 154 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |