MD HB72 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1234
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county board of education to provide transportation to and from school for certain students using a vehicle other than a Type I or Type II school vehicle when a school vehicle cannot reasonably be provided; requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with county boards of education and the Motor Vehicle Administration, to adopt regulations governing minimum vehicle and driver safety standards; requiring each county board of education to submit a report on student transportation using certain vehicles; etc.
Title
County Boards of Education – Student Transportation – Vehicles and Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197 |
2021-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-02 | House | Senate Recede |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Senate Recede |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Motion to withdraw Amendments (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Amendments (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Washington, Smith and Hornberger) |
2021-04-02 | Senate | House Requests Senate Recede |
2021-04-02 | Senate | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2021-04-01 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Washington, Smith and Hornberger) |
2021-04-01 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2021-04-01 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {174837/1 Adopted |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2021-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-12 | House | Floor Amendment {845566/1 (Delegate Washington) Adopted |
2021-03-12 | House | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted |
2021-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {265066/1 Adopted |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2020-09-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1234 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB448 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
SB448 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Subjects
Age
Calvert County
Contractors
Contracts
Counties
Disabilities
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Foster Care
Indigent Persons
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Buses
Students
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Work, Labor, and Employment
Youth
Calvert County
Contractors
Contracts
Counties
Disabilities
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Foster Care
Indigent Persons
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Buses
Students
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Work, Labor, and Employment
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 6 | 113.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 11 | 154 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |