MD SB44 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB122
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from leaving a dog outside and unattended for longer than 30 minutes without access to continuous suitable shelter during extreme weather conditions or suitable shelter or suitable shade when temperatures are above 90 degrees Fahrenheit, subject to certain exceptions; defining "extreme weather conditions" as temperatures below 32 degrees Fahrenheit or conditions during an active winter or cold weather warning or advisory; making a violation of the Act a civil offense and applying certain penalties; etc.
Title
Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 120 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (120-15) |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Floor Amendment {733925/1 (Senator West) Adopted |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Favorable |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Favorable |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2021-10-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB16 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
SB122 (Carry Over) 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
SB122 (Carry Over) 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Subjects
Abuse
Civil Actions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Dogs
Health
Penalties and Sentences
Repeat Offenders
Weather
Civil Actions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Dogs
Health
Penalties and Sentences
Repeat Offenders
Weather
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 10 | 623 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |