MD HB16 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB81

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-06 - Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from leaving a dog outside and unattended for longer than 30 minutes without access to continuous suitable shelter or suitable shade during certain weather conditions or temperatures, subject to certain exceptions; defining "extreme weather conditions" as temperatures below 32 degrees Fahrenheit or above 90 degrees or during an active weather warning; making a violation a civil offense; applying penalties ranging from a warning for a first violation to a fine of up to $1,000 for a third or subsequent offense; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-06HouseHearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2022-01-12HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2021-09-09HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB81 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB44 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Law10623(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback