MD HB964 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB222
Note: Carry Foward to future SB416
Note: Carry Foward to future SB416
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - Motion Special Order until 4/12 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - Motion Special Order until 4/12 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the driver of a vehicle traveling slower than the general speed of traffic on interstate highways located in rural areas to drive the vehicle in the right-hand lanes; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to include certain information in the State's driver education curriculum; requiring the State Highway Administration to inform drivers of certain requirements by posting certain signage and providing certain notice; prohibiting the issuance of a citation for a violation of the Act; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driving in Right–Hand Lanes – Interstate Highways in Rural Areas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/12 (Senator Beidle) Adopted |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/09 at 11:30 a.m. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2021-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-2) |
2021-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments {500112/1 Adopted |
2021-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB964 (Carry Over) 2021-04-10 - Motion Special Order until 4/12 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
HB964 (Carry Over) 2021-04-10 - Motion Special Order until 4/12 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
HB964 (Carry Over) 2021-04-10 - Motion Special Order until 4/12 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Subjects
Boundaries
Citations
Curriculum
Driver Education
Highways
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Rural Areas
Signs and Billboards
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Citations
Curriculum
Driver Education
Highways
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Rural Areas
Signs and Billboards
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 8 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 8 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |