MD HB222 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB964

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-19 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Hearing: Feb 3 @ 1:00 pm House Environment and Transportation Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the driver of a vehicle traveling slower than the general speed of traffic on an interstate highway in a rural area to drive the vehicle in the right-hand lanes under certain circumstances; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to include information about the requirement in the State's driver education curriculum and to inform drivers of the requirement through certain signage; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Driving in Right-Hand Lanes - Interstate Highways in Rural Areas

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-19HouseHearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2022-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

HB964 (Carry Over) 2021-04-10 - Motion Special Order until 4/12 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
SB416 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-26 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation21301(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation8101(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation8507(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback