MD SB416 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB964
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the driver of a vehicle traveling slower than the general speed of traffic on an interstate highway in a rural area to drive the vehicle in the right-hand lanes under certain circumstances; prohibiting the issuance of a citation for a violation of the Act; and requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to include information about the requirement in the State's driver education curriculum and to inform drivers of the requirement through certain signage.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving in Right-Hand Lanes - Interstate Highways in Rural Areas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {203225/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB222 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 565
HB964 (Carry Over) 2021-04-10 - Motion Special Order until 4/12 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
HB964 (Carry Over) 2021-04-10 - Motion Special Order until 4/12 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Subjects
Boundaries
Communications
Curriculum
Highways
Interstate Affairs
Laws and Ordinances
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Reports
Rural Areas
Signs and Billboards
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Communications
Curriculum
Highways
Interstate Affairs
Laws and Ordinances
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Reports
Rural Areas
Signs and Billboards
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 8 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 8 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |