MD HB471 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 409
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 409
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a financial institution that requires a customer to provide an answer to a security question in connection with the provision of an account to allow a customer to choose from at least two security questions options for each required security question; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 409 |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-36) |
2021-02-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-20 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB185 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 410
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Financial Institutions | 1 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |