MD SB185 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 410
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 410
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a financial institution that requires a customer to provide an answer to a security question in connection with the provision of an account to allow a customer to choose from at least two security questions options for each required security question; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 410 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (105-30) |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-08-04 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB471 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 409
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Financial Institutions | 1 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |