MD HB330 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain contract of a county superintendent of schools or a certain chief executive officer, executed on or after June 1, 2020, to include a provision that if the contract is terminated, the maximum cash settlement may not exceed certain amounts; prohibiting a certain cash settlement from including any compensation other than cash, subject to a certain exception; prohibiting a county superintendent or chief executive officer who is removed under certain circumstances from being compensated in a certain manner; etc.
Title
Education - County Boards of Education - County Superintendent Contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Contracts
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Ethics
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Employees
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
Time
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Ethics
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Employees
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
Time