MD HB233 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1102
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists to be the State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists; requiring that two licensed music therapists with at least 5 years' paid work experience be added to the Board; requiring the Board to adopt a code of ethics for the practice of music therapy; authorizing the Board to facilitate the statewide dissemination of music therapy information to music therapists; etc.
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-4) |
2021-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {916584/1 Adopted |
2021-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2020-10-29 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB82 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 800
HB1102 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1102 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Appeals
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Attorney General
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Consumer Protection
Counselors
Crimes and Punishments
Discrimination
Education
Ethics
Examinations
Fees
Fines
Fraud
Health Occupations
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Names
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Officials
Records
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
State's Attorneys
Subpoenas
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Unfair Trade Practices
Appeals
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Attorney General
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Consumer Protection
Counselors
Crimes and Punishments
Discrimination
Education
Ethics
Examinations
Fees
Fines
Fraud
Health Occupations
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Names
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Officials
Records
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
State's Attorneys
Subpoenas
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Unfair Trade Practices