MD SB82 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB766

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Renaming the State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists to be the State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists; requiring that two licensed music therapists with at least 5 years' paid work experience be added to the Board; requiring the Board to adopt a code of ethics for the practice of music therapy; authorizing the Board to facilitate the statewide dissemination of music therapy information to music therapists; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2021-02-10SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-02-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {244738/1 Adopted
2021-02-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-01-06SenateHearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-10-29SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB233 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB766 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations2101(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2102(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2201(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2202(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2206(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2501(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A01(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A10(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A11(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A12(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A13(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A14(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A15(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A16(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A17(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A18(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A19(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A2(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A20(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A21(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A22(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A23(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A24(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A25(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A3(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A4(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A5(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A6(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A7(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A8(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations2-4A9(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback