MD HB198 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a person who undertakes the towing or removal of a vehicle from a roadway following an accident or other incident to clear debris resulting from the accident or incident off the roadway and ensure that large debris is disposed of in accordance with applicable law.
Title
Vehicle Laws – Towing – Clearing and Disposal of Debris
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2021-10-20 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Accidents
Highways
Motor Vehicles
Refuse Disposal
Safety
Towing
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Highways
Motor Vehicles
Refuse Disposal
Safety
Towing
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 1133 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |