MD HB198 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Deputy Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services to exercise specified authority with the approval of the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services; and prohibiting the Deputy Secretary from exercising specified authority.
Title
Correctional Services - Delegation of the Secretary's Authority
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-26 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-09 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-29 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-24 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2012-02-21 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-25 | First Reading Judiciary |