MD HB158 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland New Start Grant Program in the Department of Labor to provide loans to covered individuals participating in eligible entrepreneurship development programs; establishing the Maryland New Start Microloan Program in the Department of Commerce to provide loans to certain individuals participating in those programs; establishing the Maryland New Start Microloan Program Fund for issuing loans under the Program and paying administrative costs; etc.
Title
Maryland New Start Act of 2022
Sponsors
Del. Jazz Lewis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-37) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {263928/1 Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (105-24) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {153429/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-01-07 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2021-10-07 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB554 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Appropriations
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Community Development
Credit
Curriculum
Economic Development
Ex-Offenders
Gender
Grants
Loans
Minorities
Poverty
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Spouses
Sunset
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Appropriations
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Community Development
Credit
Curriculum
Economic Development
Ex-Offenders
Gender
Grants
Loans
Minorities
Poverty
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Spouses
Sunset
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 5 | 1901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |