MD SB554 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland New Start Grant Program in the Maryland Department of Labor to provide grants to organizations to create or support existing entrepreneurship development programs to provide assistance to certain formerly imprisoned individuals; establishing the Maryland New Start Microloan Program in the Department of Commerce to provide loans to certain individuals participating in those programs; establishing the Maryland New Start Microloan Program Fund to provide certain loans to covered individuals; etc.
Title
Maryland New Start Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {423327/1 Adopted |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB158 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Subjects
Age
Appropriations
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Community Development
Credit
Curriculum
Economic Development
Ex-Offenders
Gender
Grants
Job Training
Loans
Mentors
Minorities
Parole and Probation
Partnerships
Poverty
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Spouses
Sunset
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Appropriations
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Community Development
Credit
Curriculum
Economic Development
Ex-Offenders
Gender
Grants
Job Training
Loans
Mentors
Minorities
Parole and Probation
Partnerships
Poverty
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Spouses
Sunset
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 5 | 1901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |