MD HB1249 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Third Reading Passed (97-36)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Third Reading Passed (97-36)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the public-private partnership agreement for the I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership Program to include certain provisions; authorizing certain revenues derived from certain tolls to be distributed to a certain special fund to be budgeted in a certain manner; requiring the Board of Public Works, on or before October 1, 2021, to request a certain determination letter from the Maryland Transportation Authority and the State Department of Transportation; etc.
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland State Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2020)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-36) |
2020-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {450118/1 Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Bicycles
Bridges and Tunnels
Communications
Construction
Contracts
Data
Environmental Matters
Examinations
Fees
Highways
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Labor and Industry, Division of
Licenses
Loans
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Minorities
Pedestrians
Privatization
Public Works, Board of
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Veterans
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Bicycles
Bridges and Tunnels
Communications
Construction
Contracts
Data
Environmental Matters
Examinations
Fees
Highways
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Labor and Industry, Division of
Licenses
Loans
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Minorities
Pedestrians
Privatization
Public Works, Board of
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Veterans
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 4 | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 4 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |