MD HB114 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-19 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor to include certain appropriations in the State budget from the Transportation Trust Fund to the Maryland Transit Administration for certain operating and capital needs in certain fiscal years; authorizing the reduction of certain appropriations under certain circumstances; requiring that certain capital appropriations be in addition to capital funds appropriated for the Purple Line; requiring the Administration to submit a certain report annually; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-19HouseHearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
2020-09-09HousePre-filed
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB199 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-18 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback