MD SB199 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB424

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Purple Line Construction Zone Grant Program to provide funds to qualified small businesses to assist in offsetting business revenue lost due to the construction of the Purple Line light rail project; requiring in each of fiscal years 2023 and 2024 the Department of Commerce to provide $1,000,000 in general funds to the Program; requiring the Department and the Maryland Transportation Administration to consult with small businesses in developing certain regulations; limiting grants awarded to $50,000 or less; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation - Maryland Transit Administration Funding and MARC Rail Extension Study (Transit Safety and Investment Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Floor Amendment 233525/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (Y: 14 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateReturned Passed
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (104-35)
2021-04-09HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-09HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2021-04-06HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2021-03-30HouseReferred Rules and Executive Nominations
2021-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (38-9)
2021-03-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-26SenateFloor Amendment {233525/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (14-32)
2021-03-26SenateFavorable with Amendments Adopted
2021-03-26SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-03-26SenateMotion Special Order until 3/30 (Senator Reilly) Rejected
2021-03-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {819334/1
2021-03-25SenateFavorable with Amendments {819334/1
2021-03-25SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2021-03-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-01-18SenateHearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-18SenateHearing canceled
2021-01-12SenateHearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-12SenateHearing canceled
2020-12-22SenateHearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2020-10-30SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB114 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
SB424 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2018(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development16101(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation2103.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation7205(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation7309(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback