MA S806 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create the Home Works programs. Housing.
Title
Creating the Home Works Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-07-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H1661 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1783 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4466
S1785 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S457 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - New draft substituted, see S2309
S202 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
S2309 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1783 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4466
S1785 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S457 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - New draft substituted, see S2309
S202 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
S2309 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S806 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S806.pdf |