MA S792 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2527

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to mandated preferences on certain public housing waiting lists. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to public housing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2527
2019-04-24JointHearing rescheduled to 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2
2019-04-16JointHearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in 437
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

S814 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S815 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S813 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H1327 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S817 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S804 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H1323 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H1263 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
S1470 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H3696 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3979 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted, see H4368
H3998 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 118 of the Acts of 2019
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2527 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback