MA S773 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in A1 & A2
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to support affordable housing with a local option for a fee to be applied to certain real estate transactions. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting affordable housing with a local option for a fee to be applied to certain real estate transactions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-10JointHearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in A1 & A2
2019-12-10JointHearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

S814 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
S813 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H2457 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S796 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H1263 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
S804 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H1273 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H1269 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H3696 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2389 (Similar To) 2019-12-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in A1 & A2
S2421 (Similar To) 2019-12-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in A1 & A2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback